ENGLAND AND WALES CRICKET TRUST

Charity number: 1112540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Scott Smith Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record
Peter David Ackerley Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
James Harry Wood Trustee 12 September 2019 None on record
Tom William Harrison Trustee 19 January 2015 None on record
IAN NICHOLAS LOVETT Chair 20 July 2016 None on record
Sancha Christina Legg Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
Ruth Leah Sienkiewicz Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record