MAYOR OF WIGAN'S CHARITY APPEAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mayoral Charity will choose to support a local charity or good cause and with the assistance of the charity committee will strive to raise funds for that chosen cause over the 12 month period. For 2009/10 the Mayor chose to provide support services for dementia sufferers and to increase public awareness of meningitis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Wigan
Governance
- 24 May 2006: Standard registration
- 13 March 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MAYORS CHARITY APPEAL COMMITTEE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/05/2009 | 20/05/2010 | 25/05/2011 | 22/05/2012 | 21/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.48k | £40.89k | £43.18k | £26.25k | £24.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £10.36k | £15.30k | £6.77k | £4.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 May 2013 | 04 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 May 2012 | 19 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2012 | 19 March 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 25 May 2011 | 06 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 May 2011 | 06 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 20 May 2010 | 25 March 2011 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2010 | 25 March 2011 | 5 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE MAYOR AND TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPOINT. THIS MUST BE DONE IN WRITING.
Area of benefit
WIGAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window