RON PEBERDY CYBERKNIFE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social events at village hall. Collections at local carnival, November. Car boot sales. Village hall sales, sponsorship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tina Swift | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Marie Peberdy | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.03k | £111 | £247 | £389 | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES BY WAY OF INTEREST OR NON-INTEREST LOAN (SUBJECT TO COMPLETION OF A FORM OF LOAN AGREEMENT AS MAY BE APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME) OR BY DIRECT GRANT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF SETTING UP A CYBERKNIFE CENTRE OR CENTRES PRINCIPALLY IN THE SOUTH WESTERN REGION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM BEING A CENTRE OR CENTRES WHICH PROVIDE TREATMENT FOR CANCER AND OTHER SUCH ILLNESS OR ILLNESSES AND TRAINING FOR STAFF BASED UPON THE MODEL OF THE CYBERKNIFE TREATMENT CENTRES AVAILABLE IN THE UNITED STATES AND TO PROVIDE RESEARCH INTO CANCER AND OTHER MEDICAL TREATMENT BASED UPON THE AMERICAN CYBERKNIFE CANCER TREATMENT TECHNIQUES.
Area of benefit
PRINCIPALLY IN THE SOUTH WESTERN REGION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old School
Stawell
Bridgwater
TA7 9AE
- Phone:
- 01278722914
- Email:
- ruthie@cyber-ron.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window