AFRICA 2000

Charity number: 1116590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 May 2020 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 May 2017 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required