ART REFUGE

Charity number: 1114353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DANIEL LEVINGE Trustee 20 March 2012 None on record
Dr Ravi Kohli Chair 21 January 2017 None on record
Polly Bagnall Trustee 26 May 2018 None on record
Dr Chris Wood Trustee 04 June 2016 None on record
Kathryn Cronin Dr Trustee 25 November 2017 None on record