PAPUA PARTNERS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Capacity Building in the region of West Papua, Indonesia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Indonesia
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 15 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON GLASSPOOL | Chair | 14 November 2014 |
|
|||||
James Hill | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Cattle | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Mavin | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jake Di Paulo | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.43k | £103.11k | £68.36k | £102.55k | £77.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.68k | £81.25k | £85.98k | £114.18k | £100.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF WEST PAPUA, INDONESIA IN SUCH WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY AND TO RELIEVE THEIR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE SUPPORT OF LOCAL ORGANISATIONS AND CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
WEST PAPUA, INDONESIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
Unit 13
Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Lytchett Matravers
POOLE
- Phone:
- 07799793244
- Email:
- info@papuapartners.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window