Accounts and annual returns LEEDS RUGBY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 02 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 02 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 04 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 13 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window