Accounts and annual returns ST NINIAN'S CHURCH, WHITBY

Charity number: 1113013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 November 2020 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required