Accounts and annual returns PETER ALLISS MASTERS

Charity number: 1113745
Charity reporting is up to date (174 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2024 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 April 2024 174 days late
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 February 2024 473 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 February 2024 473 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 December 2023 771 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 December 2023 771 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window