FRIENDS OF AMASANGO

Charity number: 1116268
Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 05 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 14 September 2016 On time Download