Financial history BOLTONS AFTER SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1114080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.02k £9.81k £8.70k £7.78k £3.82k
Total expenditure £11.84k £8.71k £9.40k £9.37k £5.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A