SOUTHWARK REFUGEE PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1116472
Charity reporting is overdue by 506 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £53.56k £34.59k £8.09k £5.66k £11.65k
Total expenditure £57.36k £31.09k £13.36k £8.34k £10.42k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £28.29k N/A N/A N/A