13TH CARDIFF SCOUT GROUP (ST PAUL'S)

Charity number: 1112604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 March 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 March 2019 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required