13TH CARDIFF SCOUT GROUP (ST PAUL'S)

Charity number: 1112604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.28k £4.52k £7.37k £6.45k £4.16k
Total expenditure £6.99k £4.64k £4.72k £7.10k £3.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A