Trustees ALINGTON HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1113430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID GEORGE THURLWELL Chair 15 June 2011
None on record
Adrian Richard Thurlwell Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Claire O'Boyle Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Michelle Lindsay-Baharie Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
John Lowe Trustee 15 January 2020
NEW HEIGHTS WARREN FARM COMMUNITY PROJECT
Received: On time
THE CITY OF DURHAM TRUST
Overdue by 110 days
Alix Collingwood Trustee 16 August 2018
None on record
Patricia Marie O'Boyle Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record