FRIENDS OF BROOKSIDE - STREET

Charity number: 1112619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 October 2021 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 September 2019 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 August 2017 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required