NORTH EAST HUMANISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for: (1)Local charities. (2) An overseas good cause.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 10 February 2006: Standard registration
- NEH (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LES MILNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Andrew Sargent | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Anderson | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bernard Nathan | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Armstrong | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Gibney | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hinton | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET MOLE | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WALKER | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MIKE TURNER | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA TURNER | Trustee | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
TONY WILD | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.81k | £13.06k | £9.47k | £4.29k | £4.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.93k | £10.40k | £11.00k | £6.37k | £8.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 01 April 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 16 March 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/02/1998 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/2015 as amended on 10 Mar 2022 as amended on 10 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMANISM, A NON-RELIGIOUS ETHICAL LIFE-STANCE; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE ABOUT HUMANIST VALUES AND BELIEFS; (3) PROMOTING GOOD FELLOWSHIP AND MUTUAL CARE AMONGST HUMANISTS LOCALLY, REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY, FOSTERING SOCIAL INTERACTION AMONGST THEM, AND PROMOTING SOCIAL, INTELLECTUAL AND CULTURAL TIES BETWEEN HUMANISTS AND SOCIETY AT LARGE; (4) PROMOTING CHARITABLE PURPOSES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHARITABLE CAUSES HAVING VALUES COMPATIBLE WITH HUMANISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: LOCALLY IN THE AREAS OF TYNESIDE, NEWCASTLE, NORTHUMBERLAND, WEARSIDE, SUNDERLAND, COUNTY DURHAM, TEESSIDE, CLEVELAND AND REDCAR, AND MIDDLEBOROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 GROSVENOR AVENUE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 2NQ
- Phone:
- 01912812923
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window