Trustees WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Widdowson Chair 18 July 2018
None on record
Kevin Michael Doyle Trustee 01 October 2022
OKIDO NATURAL HEALTH EDUCATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Karen Ann McArdle Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Malcolm Robert Grady Trustee 18 July 2022
JOSEPH COWEN LIFELONG LEARNING CENTRE CIO
Received: On time
Christine Grant Trustee 14 July 2022
COMMUNITY FOCUS INCLUSIVE ARTS
Received: On time
THE MAGISTRATES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Patricia Hazel Kynaston Trustee 13 May 2020
None on record
Geoffrey Mark Layer Trustee 18 July 2019
FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
Robin Cook Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
Narinder Uppal Trustee 15 December 2016
None on record
Marion Flett Trustee 04 July 2016
None on record
PETER THREADKELL Trustee 04 July 2016
None on record
Lindsay Pearson Trustee 12 March 2016
None on record
Jonathan Edwin Gamble Trustee 15 July 2015
THE CITY LITERARY INSTITUTE
Received: On time
LEIGH AND BRANSFORD MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time