ST MAGNUS THE MARTYR BELLS FUND

Charity number: 1112870
Charity reporting is overdue by 763 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required