ST MAGNUS THE MARTYR BELLS FUND

Charity number: 1112870
Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £7.33k £6.06k £3.66k £2.82k £2.65k
Total expenditure £4.27k £0 £1.98k £2.39k £1.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A