WOODHOUSE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity number: 1112687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £157.07k £155.06k £362.79k £249.19k £429.39k
Total expenditure £146.15k £143.34k £188.54k £253.22k £290.72k
Income from government contracts £83.10k £65.30k N/A £90.80k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £160.95k N/A £239.65k