Accounts and annual returns RELIEF FOR ALL COMMUNITIES (RFAC) LTD

Charity number: 1118071
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2012 29 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 03 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required