HEALTH THROUGH SPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1113480
Charity reporting is overdue by 520 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 520 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 520 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 11 June 2017 On time Download