HEALTH THROUGH SPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1113480
Charity reporting is overdue by 524 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £37.17k £40.82k £39.07k £46.26k £28.48k
Total expenditure £51.42k £28.56k £38.74k £40.11k £36.65k
Income from government contracts N/A £5.00k £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £11.50k £14.77k £11.50k