MAIDEN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1112667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the benefit of the people living, working and studying in Camden Central. To enter into partnerships with community and statutory providers with similar objectives to provide services throughout the Borough of Camden and adjacent Boroughs. To establish a Community Centre and to maintain and manage it for activities promoted by the Association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £308,222
Total expenditure: £358,936

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden
  • Islington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2006: Standard registration
  • 27 February 2013: Funds received from 297129 MAIDEN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDITH HELEN POWELL Chair 06 November 2014
THE COMMUNITY OF CELEBRATION CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
NORTH LONDON PASTORAL ASSISTANTS SCHEME
Received: On time
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Miriam Mannish Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Khedijah Ali Mohamed-Nur Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Fatima Yousuf Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Marian Larragy Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
DAVID MICHAEL SHARRATT Trustee
None on record
VALERIE AMAJOUTT Trustee
None on record
JOHN COWLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £483.88k £393.22k £375.26k £332.79k £308.22k
Total expenditure £513.73k £356.85k £361.81k £340.98k £358.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £350.44k £290.64k £271.55k £200.62k £155.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MAIDEN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE
156 ST. PAULS CRESCENT
LONDON
NW1 9XZ
Phone:
02072679586