PROGRESSIVE DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1115578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 March 2020 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 February 2017 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required