Financial history WORD OF LIFE MINISTRIES (LONDON AND BIRMINGHAM)

Charity number: 1113543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £31.04k £20.63k £25.97k £22.41k £16.58k
Total expenditure £33.80k £21.15k £24.93k £12.47k £7.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A