Financial history FIVE TALENTS UK LTD

Charity number: 1113969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £797.86k £823.79k £929.13k £1.03m £1.17m
Total expenditure £703.97k £898.38k £934.23k £920.10k £1.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £796.55k £821.88k £928.31k £1.03m £1.17m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.30k £1.92k £670 £1.26k £1.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £151 £17 £107
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £617.72k £796.24k £835.58k £826.52k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £86.25k £102.14k £98.65k £93.58k £127.70k
Expenditure - Governance £14.07k £16.20k £21.58k £27.89k £35.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £478.02k £629.32k £641.71k £645.24k £776.89k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0