ESSEX COUPLE ADVICE

Charity number: 1113609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 13/05/2016 13/05/2017 13/05/2018 13/05/2019 13/05/2020
Total gross income £1.30k £1.38k £3.70k £4.20k £7.89k
Total expenditure £1.25k £1.36k £3.65k £4.00k £7.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A