Accounts and annual returns AL MUSTAFA WELFARE TRUST INTERNATIONAL LTD

Charity number: 1118492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 25 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 26 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 28 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 28 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 23 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 23 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window