Governing document OPTIMUM POPULATION TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 04 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2019 as amended on 28 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES RELATING TO HUMAN POPULATION WORLDWIDE AND ITS IMPACT ON ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY; (2) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH TO DETERMINE OPTIMUM AND ECOLOGICALLY SUSTAINABLE HUMAN POPULATION LEVELS IN ALL OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE WORLD AND TO PUBLICISE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND (3) TO ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION BY PROMOTING POLICIES, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ANY OTHER PART OR PARTS OF THE WORLD, WHICH WILL LEAD OR CONTRIBUTE TO THE ACHIEVEMENT OF STABLE HUMAN POPULATION LEVELS WHICH ALLOW ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.