Trustees OPTIMUM POPULATION TRUST

Charity number: 1114109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Lamb Parkin Chair 18 June 2019
None on record
Harry James Marven Trustee 30 October 2021
None on record
Victoria Katherine Poll Trustee 30 October 2021
None on record
Lisa Susan Mitchell Trustee 30 October 2021
None on record
Dr Rebecca Jane Foljambe Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record
Christopher Padley Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record
Anna Victoria Hughes Trustee 17 November 2018
None on record
Philippa Ann Hayes Trustee 06 October 2018
None on record
Emma Danielle Olliff Trustee 21 October 2017
None on record