Accounts and annual returns MATCHMOTHERS.ORG

Charity number: 1116218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 13 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 14 June 2024 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required