Financial history MATCHMOTHERS.ORG

Charity number: 1116218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £11.70k £18.79k £21.21k £6.92k £13.86k
Total expenditure £12.75k £9.53k £27.61k £7.58k £9.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A