KASHMIR ORPHAN RELIEF TRUST

Charity number: 1113836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE MAIN ACTIVITIES OF THE CHARITY DURING THE YEAR WERE RAISING FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING RELIEF TO THE ORPHANS. WITH THE ASSISTANCE OF THE CHARITY, THE NEEDY CHILDREN WERE GIVEN SHELTER AND BARE NECESSITY SUCH AS FOOD, CLOTHES, MEDICINES AND EDUCATION.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020

Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public. Works with a professional fundraiser with an agreement in place. It does not work with a commercial participator.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Pakistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMMED AKHTAR Chair None on record
ZAHEER HUSSAIN Trustee 01 August 2014 None on record
MOHAMMED YAQOOB Trustee 12 August 2018 None on record
ALI ASGHAR LATIF Trustee None on record
MOHAMMED MOBASHIR AFZAL Trustee 07 November 2013 None on record
MOHAMMED RASHID BASHIR Trustee
KHIDMAT WELFARE TRUST Overdue by 113 days
NASAR FAROOQ Trustee
HIGHCROFT HOUSEHOLDERS ASSOCIATION Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £901.29k £1.19m £1.01m £1.69m £3.30m
Total expenditure £864.27k £947.12k £913.46k £1.30m £1.38m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £901.29k £1.19m £1.01m £1.51m £2.98m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £1.05k £2.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £176.32k £320.78k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £693.00k £790.00k £771.40k £1.04m £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £96.57k £94.92k £63.07k £258.51k £251.88k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £5.96k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £74.71k £62.20k £78.99k £4.94k £6.06k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Own use assets £4.91k £5.13k £3.92k £24.26k £19.51k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £336.44k £579.20k £685.12k £1.05m £2.98m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.67k £6.27k £10.00k £13.28k £12.89k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 25 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 02 December 2019 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 02 December 2019 93 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 06 February 2019 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 06 February 2019 159 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 31 August 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

Contact information

Address:
KASHMIR ORPHAN RELIEF TRUST
UNIT F5, LEICESTER BUSINESS CENTRE
111 ROSS WALK
LEICESTER
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE4 5HH
Phone:
03001237774
Website:

www.kort.org.uk