HILLINGDON ACTION GROUP FOR ADDICTION MANAGEMENT (HAGAM)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HAGAM provides treatment and support services to people and communities affected by addiction and other associated problems including homelessness. HAGAM also offers specialist training to professionals and general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £371,667 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 24 January 2006: Standard registration
- 31 October 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 31 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1045701 HILLINGDON MIND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £459.09k | £366.46k | £448.89k | £396.27k | £383.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.42k | £346.99k | £400.29k | £512.95k | £457.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £371.67k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 07 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 09 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO HAVE ADDICTIONS IDENTIFIED AS HARMFUL THROUGH SUPPORT TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM THESE ADDICTIONS AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS IN ADDICTION MANAGEMENT; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND EMPLOYERS ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECT ON SOCIETY OF ADDICTIONS IDENTIFIED AS HARMFUL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HILLINGDON, GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window