Accounts and annual returns DEVELOPMENT COMMUNITY CENTRE (DCC)

Charity number: 1115511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 June 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2022 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2022 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2022 1093 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required