THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH HEDGERLEY

Charity number: 1113200
Charity reporting is overdue by 1792 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £2.65k £1.62k £9.10k £5.90k £430
Total expenditure £3.25k £260 £85 £6.21k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A