Accounts and annual returns THE CHARLES FREDERICK GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1113270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 01 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 08 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required