ST TERESA'S RC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide additional resources and equipment to St Teresa's Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 17 January 2006: Standard registration
- FOSTERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Jury | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Blackiston | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Riley | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | £5.35k | £9.60k | £8.26k | £8.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.98k | £2.11k | £2.66k | £21.40k | £10.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ASHFORD, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Upper Queens Road
ASHFORD
Kent
TN24 8HL
- Phone:
- 07412978207
- Email:
- clairerberry@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window