NAILSEA HISTORIC MONUMENTS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the summer and following a grant from Historic England, North Somerset Council commissioned an Ecology Survey of the Scheduled Middle Engine Pit, along with an Archaeological Condition Survey. Subsequently essential conservation work was carried out on the Engine House, Horse Whim and Check House. Further work is anticipated and eventual landscaping.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- North Somerset
Governance
- 07 July 2006: Standard registration
- 14 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 January 2021: Funds transferred to 279998 AVON INDUSTRIAL BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65 | £0 | £1 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 17 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 19 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED 4 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC INTEREST IN NAILSEA. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE MONUMENTS SCHEDULED BY ENGLISH HERITAGE IN NAILSEA AND TO ENSURE REASONABLE PUBLIC ACCESS
Area of benefit
NAILSEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window