RESCARE: THE SOCIETY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES

Charity number: 1112766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.66k £8.27k £10.16k £6.61k £30.59k
Total expenditure £43.99k £49.79k £49.70k £55.68k £33.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k