RESCARE: THE SOCIETY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES

Charity number: 1112766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Shearer Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record
James Howell Trustee 25 September 2020 None on record
VALERIE DAVISON Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
EILEEN BAILEY Trustee 20 October 2014 None on record
BRIDGET ANN BENNETT Chair 30 April 2012 None on record
Julie Abbott Trustee 25 September 2020 None on record
Dr Catherine Booth Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record
Helen Wilman Trustee 25 September 2020 None on record