COMMUNITY ACTION HINCKLEY AND BOSWORTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the interests of voluntary and community sector organisations through community development and regeneration support, and community empowerment and participation. Responds to identified needs and wants to improve quality of life, particularly those who are disadvantaged, excluded or oppressed, to support and enable them to be empowered to make more of their lives, aspirations and futures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 04 April 2006: Standard registration
- 07 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- VOLUNTARY ACTION HINCKLEY AND BOSWORTH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.80k | £29.21k | £43.47k | £48.68k | £5.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.77k | £17.79k | £41.89k | £46.71k | £4.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £24.00k | £12.46k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £19.13k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 07 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 13 June 2016 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 13 June 2016 | 134 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 19 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
19 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 28 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 9 FEBRUARY 2011. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN HINCKLEY AND BOSWORTH BOROUGH AND THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND REGENERATION SUPPORT AND PROMOTING COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT AND PARTICIPATION AND BY ACTING TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY SECTOR ORGANISATIONS
Area of benefit
LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF HINCKLEY & BOSWORTH BOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window