THE TAVISTOCK SUBSCRIPTION LIBRARY

Charity number: 1118323
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £1.69k £1.71k £2.13k £1.63k £2.52k
Total expenditure £2.84k £2.91k £1.90k £1.11k £2.34k