Accounts and annual returns VIDYAPITH

Charity number: 1114072
Charity reporting is up to date (113 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 July 2022 30 August 2023 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 09 July 2021 30 August 2023 478 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 July 2020 30 August 2023 843 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 09 July 2019 30 August 2023 1208 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 09 July 2018 08 October 2019 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 July 2018 Not Required