Financial history VIDYAPITH

Charity number: 1114072
Charity reporting is up to date (113 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/07/2018 09/07/2019 09/07/2020 09/07/2021 09/07/2022
Total gross income £11.46k £10.80k £17.20k £18.50k £16.00k
Total expenditure £10.11k £2.70k £7.80k £11.00k £15.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A