CHASE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chase Council for Voluntary Service promotes and supports the third sector in Cannock Chase by: Developing new and existing voluntary groups; Offering a range of office services and advice; Representing local groups in central and local government; Liaising between voluntary organisations and statutory agencies and supporting the development of key partnerships in Cannock Chase
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 23 February 2006: Standard registration
- 29 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1161077 SUPPORT STAFFORDSHIRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £655.29k | £607.34k | £524.59k | £561.57k | £338.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £597.28k | £679.74k | £593.35k | £558.69k | £464.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £565.10k | £487.59k | £369.01k | £445.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £60.57k | £80.59k | £116.89k | £82.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £400 | £410 | £337 | £304 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £29.23k | £38.75k | £38.35k | £33.84k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £591.19k | £679.74k | £593.35k | £558.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £4.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 18 March 2016 | 47 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 05 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 13 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 13 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 04 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 09 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF CANNOCK CHASE COUNCIL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (B) PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND, TO THAT END, TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. PROVIDED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THESE CHARITABLE PURPOSES, THE COUNCIL WILL SEEK TO CHALLENGE ALL FORMS OF OPPRESSION AND INEQUALITY AND TO GIVE PRIORITY TO WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHOSE FULL PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY IS LIMITED BY ECONOMIC POLITICAL AND SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF CANNOCK CHASE COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window