ORGANISATION FOR ANTI-CONVULSANT SYNDROME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation for Anti-convulsant Syndromes works to support families affected by disabilities caused by the adverse effects of medications used in pregnancy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Jo Cozens | Chair | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lapidge | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Keely | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106 | £994 | £507 | £1.10k | £1.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £971 | £696 | £893 | £447 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 November 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2023 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY FETAL ANTI-CONVULSANT SYNDROME AND ANY RELATED CONDITION AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BY BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC INTO FETAL ANTI-CONVULSANT SYNDROME AND ITS IMPLICATIONS FOR THE FAMILY C) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, EFFECTS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF FETAL ANTI-CONVULSANT SYNDROME AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Aberfawr Terrace
Abertridwr
Caerphilly
CF83 4EL
- Phone:
- 07940002377
- Email:
- oacscharity.org@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window