POCKLINGTON AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION, ARTS, RECREATION GROUPS: Art; Astronomy; Birds; Card/Board Games; Computers; Crafts; Croquet; Current Affairs; Dancing; Family History; Film; Gardening; Golf; History; Languages; Medieval Churches; Music; Philosophy; Photography; Pilates; Psychology; Pub Lunches; Quiz; Reading; Sewing; Singing; Swimming/fitness; Theatre; Travel; Walking; Wine Appreciation; Writing;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Smith | Chair | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Kay | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Stubbs | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Julian Voke | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mary Burn | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harold Simon Eggleston | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerald William Hutchinson | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauine Slater | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Kevin Barrett | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Waugh | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Hebden | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.10k | £8.12k | £10.50k | £9.59k | £9.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.90k | £6.16k | £8.13k | £9.67k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/2014 AS AMENDED ON 11/02/2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
POCKLINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Springdale Road
Market Weighton
YORK
YO43 3JT
- Phone:
- 01430 803439
- Email:
- secretarypockdu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window